NV AB110 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 69.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 69.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public safety; requiring the Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles to release the contact information of a person who has been issued a traffic citation to a court or its traffic violations bureau under certain circumstances; revising provisions governing citations for minor traffic and related violations; revising provisions relating to hearings on alleged traffic and related violations; prohibiting the issuance of a bench warrant for a person's failure to appear in court for a parking violation in certain circumstances; removing the time limitation on the imposition of certain administrative assessments for the provision of court facilities; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to minor traffic and related violations. (BDR 43-427)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 69. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 656 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 656.) To printer. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 223.) To printer. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |