NV AB117 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - In Assembly. To enrollment.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to gaming; revising provisions relating to charitable gaming; requiring the Nevada Gaming Commission to adopt regulations providing a procedure to appeal the denial of the registration to operate a charitable lottery or charitable game; requiring the Commission to adopt regulations establishing the fees that a qualified organization must submit to the Chair of the Nevada Gaming Control Board when registering to operate a charitable lottery or charitable game; increasing the penalty for the commission of certain unauthorized acts relating to lotteries; repealing provisions relating to charitable games; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to charitable gaming. (BDR 41-715)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-16SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly.
2019-05-15SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-22AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 332 and 563.) To printer.
2019-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2019-02-04AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-01-31AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback