NV AB136 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 174.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 174.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public construction; revising the manner in which the prevailing wage is determined; lowering the estimated thresholds at or above which prevailing wage requirements apply to certain public construction projects; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to public construction. (BDR 28-145)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 174. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |