NV AB153 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to crimes; making it a crime to negligently store or leave a firearm under certain circumstances; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the storage of firearms. (BDR 15-119)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-18Senate(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 9, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-22AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 388.) To printer.
2019-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-18AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-15AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback