NV AB154 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 8.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 8.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to secondhand dealers; revising certain requirements for reporting transactions by a secondhand dealer; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises certain requirements relating to secondhand dealers. (BDR 54-625)
Sponsors
Rep. Al Kramer [R] | Sen. Lisa Krasner [R] | Rep. Michael Sprinkle [D] | Sen. Robin Titus [R] |
Rep. Jim Wheeler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 8. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |