NV AB170 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 61.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 61.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to insurance; requiring an insurer to provide certain information relating to accessing health care services to the Office of Consumer Health Assistance; requiring the Governor's Consumer Health Advocate to submit a report of such information to the Legislature; requiring an insurer to offer a health benefit plan regardless of health status; requiring the Advocate to take certain actions to assist consumers in accessing health care services; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to health insurance coverage. (BDR 57-278)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 61. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 655 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 655.) To printer. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 506.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |