NV AB181 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 65.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 65.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to employment; establishing specific provisions governing practices of employers relating to employee attendance; providing for administrative penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing employment attendance practices. (BDR 53-833)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 65. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 96.) To printer. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |