NV AB183 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 178.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 178.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to corrections; prohibiting certain correctional services from being provided by a private entity; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Prohibits certain correctional services from being provided by private entities. (BDR 16-290)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 178. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 12, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 44.) To printer. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |