NV AB186 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to elections; enacting the Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes related to elections. (BDR 24-678)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assembly(No further action taken.)
2019-05-30AssemblyBill read. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
2019-05-30AssemblyReturned to Assembly with Governor's veto message.
2019-05-30AssemblyVetoed by the Governor.
2019-05-24AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time.
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-17SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2019-04-17SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 23, Nays: 17, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2019-04-16AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 55.) To printer.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback