NV AB19 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 477.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 477.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to orders for protection; revising provisions relating to service of process of temporary and extended orders for protection against domestic violence; increasing the duration that certain temporary and extended orders for protection remain effective; increasing the penalty for certain violations of temporary and extended orders for protection against domestic violence; renaming the Repository for Information Concerning Orders for Protection Against Domestic Violence to the Repository for Information Concerning Orders for Protection; requiring the Repository for Information Concerning Orders for Protection to include certain information and other records relating to orders for protection against a person alleged to have committed the crime of sexual assault, orders for protection against stalking, aggravated stalking or harassment and orders for protection against domestic violence; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions related to certain temporary and extended orders for protection. (BDR 3-417)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Chapter 477. |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: None, Excused: 3, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 296.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-18 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-15 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |