NV AB191 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making an appropriation to the Division of Public and Behavioral Health of the Department of Health and Human Services to award grants of money to certain counties, federally recognized Indian tribes or other persons or entities for the purpose of providing Mobile Outreach Safety Team services; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes an appropriation to the Division of Public and Behavioral Health of the Department of Health and Human Services to award grants to provide Mobile Outreach Safety Team services in certain counties. (BDR S-667)
Sponsors
Rep. Al Kramer [R] | Sen. Robin Titus [R] | Sen. Joseph Hardy [R] | Rep. Teresa Benitez-Thompson [D] |
Rep. Richard Carrillo [D] | Rep. John Hambrick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Notice of exemption. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6294/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/AB/AB191.pdf |