NV AB201 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 92.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 92.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions pertaining to informational statements provided for the adoption of administrative regulations. (BDR 18-83)
Title
Revises provisions pertaining to informational statements provided for the adoption of administrative regulations. (BDR 18-83)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 92. | |
2011-05-19 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-18 | Senate Amendment No. 549 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-10 | In Assembly. | |
2011-05-09 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-09 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-05-07 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 549.) To printer. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-04 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2011-04-04 | In Senate. | |
2011-04-01 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-03-31 | Read second time. | |
2011-03-29 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-02-23 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-02-22 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |