NV AB204 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 285.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 285.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that marriage licenses and certificates of marriage may include the name to be used by each spouse after the marriage. (BDR 11-743)
Title
Provides that marriage licenses and certificates of marriage may include the name to be used by each spouse after the marriage. (BDR 11-743)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 285. |
2017-05-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2017-04-13 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 190 and 228.) To printer. |
2017-04-11 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-11 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2017-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d). |