NV AB206 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to renewable energy and the renewable portfolio standard. (BDR 58-746)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to renewable energy and the renewable portfolio standard. (BDR 58-746)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-16AssemblyVetoed by the Governor.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05AssemblyTo enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblySenate Amendment Nos. 1126 and 1144 concurred in.
2017-06-05AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-05SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
2017-06-05SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2017-06-04SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . To Secretary's desk.
2017-06-04SenateTo printer.
2017-06-04SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2017-06-04SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1144.)
2017-06-04SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2017-06-04SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2017-06-04SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2017-06-03SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1126.) To printer.
2017-06-03SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
2017-05-24SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-24AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-05-24AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-05-24AssemblyTo printer.
2017-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 12.)
2017-05-24AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2017-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 817.)
2017-05-23AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-13AssemblyWaiver granted effective: April 12, 2017.
2017-03-07AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-13AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
2017-02-13AssemblyPrefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=410
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB206.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB206_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB206_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB206_R3.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB206_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=913&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=206&fldBillname=AB206
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1393&fldReprint=3&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=206&fldBillname=AB206
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1047&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=206&fldBillname=AB206
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1359&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=206&fldBillname=AB206

Bill Comments

feedback