NV AB206 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 111.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 111.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to emergency management; requiring the Chief of the Division of Emergency Management of the Department of Public Safety to develop written plans for the mitigation of, preparation for, response to and recovery from emergencies or disasters; abolishing the Committee on Training in Search and Rescue and transferring certain of its duties to the Board of Search and Rescue; requiring the Department of Health and Human Services to develop a written plan to address behavioral health needs in an emergency or disaster; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to emergency management. (BDR 36-864)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Chapter 111. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-03-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |