NV AB229 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 597.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 597.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to historic preservation; requiring the Administrator of the Office of Historic Preservation of the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources to establish and administer a technical advisory program for the protection and preservation of certain buildings and structures; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires the establishment of a technical advisory program for the protection and preservation of certain buildings and structures. (BDR 33-299)
Sponsors
Rep. Heidi Swank [D] | Rep. Maggie Carlton [D] | Rep. Lesley Cohen [D] | Rep. John Ellison [R] |
Rep. Ozzie Fumo [D] | Sen. Robin Titus [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Chapter 597. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 103.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |