NV AB230 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 181.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 181.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to historic preservation; providing a procedure for the governing body of a county or city to designate a historic neighborhood; clarifying the authority of the Office of Historic Preservation of the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources to include landmarks in its list of historic places that are eligible for listing in the State Register of Historic Places; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing historic preservation. (BDR 22-298)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Chapter 181. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 69.) To printer. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |