NV AB232 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 424.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 424.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to hospitals; requiring certain hospitals to participate as a provider in the Medicare program; eliminating the designation of general hospitals; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes to provisions governing hospitals. (BDR 40-158)
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Yeager [D] | Rep. Daniele Monroe-Moreno [D] | Rep. Teresa Benitez-Thompson [D] | Rep. Maggie Carlton [D] |
Rep. Jason Frierson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 424. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 742 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 742.) To printer. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 6, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-01 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |