NV AB240 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 144.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 144.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to regional planning; requiring representatives from certain counties and cities to meet jointly for a specified period to identify issues and make recommendations regarding the orderly management of growth in their region; requiring such counties, in consultation with such cities, to prepare certain reports individually and jointly during that period; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires representatives from certain counties and cities to meet jointly and prepare reports addressing the orderly management of growth in their region. (BDR S-1043)
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Daly [D] | Rep. Teresa Benitez-Thompson [D] | Rep. Al Kramer [R] | Sen. Julia Ratti [D] |
Sen. Ben Kieckhefer [R] | Sen. Lisa Krasner [R] | Rep. Jill Tolles [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 144. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 47.) To printer. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |