NV AB248 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to settlement agreements; prohibiting settlement agreements from containing provisions that prohibit or restrict a party from disclosing certain information relating to conduct that would qualify as a sexual offense under certain circumstances or discrimination on the basis of sex or a retaliation claim thereof under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits a settlement agreement from containing provisions that prohibit or restrict a party from disclosing certain information under certain circumstances. (BDR 2-1004)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time.
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 7, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-22AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 303.) To printer.
2019-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-13AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-12AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback