NV AB267 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 27 @ 8:00 am Senate Judiciary Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to actions concerning persons; providing for the compensation of certain persons who were wrongfully convicted; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides compensation to certain persons who were wrongfully convicted. (BDR 3-657)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-05-21SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-21AssemblyTo Senate.
2019-05-21AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-20AssemblyTo printer.
2019-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 697.) Dispensed with reprinting.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 195.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-15AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-14AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback