NV AB285 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 180.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to civil actions; enacting provisions relating to a mental or physical examination of certain persons in a civil action; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts provisions relating to a mental or physical examination of certain persons in a civil action. (BDR 4-1027)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30AssemblyChapter 180.
2019-05-29AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-05-28AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.) To Assembly.
2019-05-22SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-21SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time.
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-18SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 7, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-17AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-16AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 196.) To printer.
2019-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback