NV AB286 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to personal financial administration; revising provisions relating to certain fees charged by the clerk of the court; revising provisions relating to the statutory rule against perpetuities; clarifying certain provisions relating to nonprobate transfer of property upon death; providing that certain sums derived from the sale of a homestead are exempt from the execution of a judgment in certain circumstances; revising provisions that govern the transfer of community property or separate property into a trust; revising certain provisions that govern wills and estates of deceased persons; revising certain provisions of the Uniform Powers of Appointment Act; revising certain provisions that govern trusts and the administration of trusts; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to trusts and estates. (BDR 2-1028)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-05-24SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-23SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 728.) To printer.
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-23SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 305.) To printer.
2019-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback