NV AB301 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to jails; requiring the person appointed to administer a city jail and the sheriff of a county to report, as applicable, certain information concerning deaths in the city jail or county jail to the governing body of the city or the board of county commissioners; requiring the person appointed to administer a city jail and the sheriff to investigate certain deaths in the city jail or county jail, as applicable; requiring each governing body of a city and board of county commissioners to take certain actions relating to reports regarding deaths in the city jail or county jail, as applicable; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to jails. (BDR 16-769)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 385.) To printer.
2019-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback