NV AB307 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal gangs; establishing provisions governing the use of a gang database by a local law enforcement agency; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions governing the use of a gang database by a local law enforcement agency. (BDR 14-897)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 198.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback