NV AB315 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to records of criminal history; authorizing a person who was wrongfully arrested to submit an application to the court to expunge all records relating to the arrest; requiring the court to order that such records be expunged upon verification that the person was wrongfully arrested; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the expungement of all records relating to the wrongful arrest of a person in certain circumstances. (BDR 14-831)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-18Senate(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 306.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback