NV AB336 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to victims of crime; establishing provisions relating to certain victims of crime who petition for certain temporary federal immigration benefits; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions relating to certain victims of crime. (BDR 16-46)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
2019-05-23SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-22SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-21SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time.
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-22AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 199.) To printer.
2019-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-20AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback