NV AB356 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 495.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 495.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; establishing provisions relating to the filing of a petition for a hearing to establish the factual innocence of a person based on newly discovered evidence; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing criminal procedure. (BDR 3-863)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Chapter 495. |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 1064 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1064.) To printer. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 307.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |