NV AB366 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to homes; requiring the Division of Emergency Management of the Department of Public Safety to establish a program to provide assistance to persons who own and occupy certain damaged homes; requiring the expenditure of money from the Emergency Assistance Account for the program for certain purposes; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires the Division of Emergency Management of the Department of Public Safety to establish a program to provide assistance to persons who own and occupy certain damaged homes. (BDR 36-1077)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6688/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/AB/AB366.pdf |