NV AB376 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 358.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 358.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to persons in custody; providing that before a prisoner who is in the custody of a county or city jail or detention facility is questioned about his or her immigration status, the prisoner must be informed about the purpose of such questions; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to persons in custody. (BDR 16-675)
Sponsors
Sen. Dina Neal [D] | Sen. Edgar Flores [D] | Rep. Ozzie Fumo [D] | Rep. Richard Carrillo [D] |
Sen. Richard Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Chapter 358. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 803 and 925 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-25 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint. To Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 925.) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 803.) To printer. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | To printer. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 8, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 634.) Dispensed with reprinting. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 384.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |