NV AB377 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 60.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 60.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to vehicles; authorizing an exemption to certain weight and length limits on certain vehicles operating in this State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing weight and length limits on certain vehicles. (BDR 43-802)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 60. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 650 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 650.) To printer. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |