NV AB378 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 419.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 419.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to mental health; requiring the model plan for the management of a crisis, emergency or suicide involving a school to include a plan for responding to a pupil with a mental illness; clarifying that consent from any parent or legal guardian of a person is not necessary for the emergency admission of that person; requiring a person who applies for the emergency admission of a child to attempt to obtain the consent of a parent or guardian of the child and maintain documentation of such an attempt; requiring the notification of a parent or guardian of a child of the emergency admission of the child; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to the transportation and admission of certain persons alleged to be a danger to themselves or others to certain facilities or hospitals. (BDR 34-711)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 419. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 852 and 889 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 889.) To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 852.) To printer. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 6, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 585.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 247.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |