NV AB393 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 531.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 531.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental administration; prohibiting the foreclosure of real property or a lien against a unit in a common-interest community owned by a federal worker, tribal worker, state worker or household member of such a worker during a government shutdown in certain circumstances; providing certain protections to a tenant who is a federal worker, tribal worker, state worker or household member of such a worker during a government shutdown; prohibiting a person from repossessing the vehicle of a federal worker, tribal worker, state worker or household member of such a worker during a government shutdown; authorizing the provision of assistance in paying for natural gas and electricity to a federal worker, tribal worker, state worker or household member of such a worker during a government shutdown; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Provides protections to certain governmental and tribal employees and certain other persons during a government shutdown. (BDR 3-1015)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Chapter 531. |
2019-06-08 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 766 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 766.) To printer. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 308.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |