NV AB4 | 2020 | 31st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-20 - No further action taken.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to governmental financial administration; revising the formula for determining the measure of the tax on the net proceeds of minerals; creating the Supplemental Support for Classroom Instruction Account; requiring the transfer of a portion of the tax on the net proceeds of minerals to the Account; providing for the use of money in the Account; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the tax on the net proceeds of minerals extracted and the use thereof. (BDR 32-25)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-20SenateNo further action taken.
2020-07-19SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly.
2020-07-18SenateTo printer.
2020-07-18SenateRead third time. Lost. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.)
2020-07-18SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2020-07-18SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 6.)
2020-07-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2020-07-18SenateTo committee.
2020-07-18SenateRe-referred to Committee of the Whole.
2020-07-18SenateAction of refusal of passage rescinded.
2020-07-16SenateRead third time. Lost. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.)
2020-07-16SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2020-07-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2020-07-16SenateTo committee.
2020-07-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole.
2020-07-16SenateIn Senate.
2020-07-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.) To Senate.
2020-07-16AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2020-07-16AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 5.) To printer.
2020-07-16AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2020-07-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2020-07-16AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2020-07-16AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback