NV AB408A | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Note: Carry Over of previous AB408
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to health care; requiring the State Plan for Medicaid to cover certain preventive health care services and maternity and newborn care; revising provisions relating to the dispensing of contraceptives; requiring insurers to offer health insurance coverage regardless of the health status of a person; requiring insurers to allow the covered adult child of an insured to remain covered by the health insurance of the insured until 26 years of age; requiring insurers to provide coverage for certain family planning services and supplies and preventive health care services for women, adults and children at no cost; requiring insurers to provide coverage for maternity and newborn care; prohibiting providers of health care and insurers from discriminating against a person on certain grounds; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to Medicaid and health insurance. (BDR 38-957)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | Bill read with Governor's veto message. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Made Special Order of Business for Wednesday, February 6, 2019, at 11:45 a.m. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Returned from Secretary of State. |
Same As/Similar To
AB408 (Carry Over) 2017-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6066/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/AB/AB408_79.pdf |