NV AB411 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to vehicles; establishing civil penalties for certain traffic and related violations; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Provides for civil penalties for certain traffic and related violations. (BDR 43-426)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-18 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 5, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 383.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |