NV AB422 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To Assembly.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; revising provisions relating to material witnesses; revising provisions relating to a court or officer issuing certain warrants for arrest if a person fails to appear as a witness; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing criminal procedure. (BDR 14-1096)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To Assembly.
2019-05-24SenateTo printer.
2019-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.)
2019-05-24SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2019-05-24SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 965.)
2019-05-24SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-23SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 807.) To printer.
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-23SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 602.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback