NV AB439 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 187.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing taxation of the sale, storage, use or other consumption of certain property by a licensed veterinarian. (BDR 32-1017)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing taxation of the sale, storage, use or other consumption of certain property by a licensed veterinarian. (BDR 32-1017)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 187.
2017-05-23AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-19AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2017-05-18SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-05-17SenateRead second time.
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee.
2017-04-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 295.) To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-29AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback