NV AB465 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee.
Pending: Senate Growth and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to energy; requiring electric utilities to offer an expanded solar access program to certain customers and to submit a plan to the Public Utilities Commission of Nevada for such a program; requiring the Commission to adopt regulations establishing standards for the program; requiring the Commission to approve a plan for an expanded solar access program if certain requirements are met; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions relating to solar energy. (BDR 58-872)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 396.) To printer.
2019-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback