NV AB486 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 574.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 574.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to outdoor recreation; creating the Division of Outdoor Recreation within the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources; providing for the appointment and duties of the Administrator of the Division; creating the Advisory Board on Outdoor Recreation to advise the Administrator of the Division on any matter concerning outdoor recreation in this State; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Creates the Division of Outdoor Recreation within the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources. (BDR 18-840)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Chapter 574. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | To printer. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 6, Vacant: 1.) |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1048.) |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 365.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |