NV AB534 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Chapter 620.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Chapter 620.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to emergency response; transferring the administration of the process governing the application and determination of eligibility for compensation from the Fund for the Compensation of Victims of Crime from the Department of Administration and the State Board of Examiners to the Department of Health and Human Services; requiring the Director of the Department of Health and Human Services to adopt a State Plan for Services for Victims of Crime; revising procedures governing claims for such compensation; imposing requirements relating to the development of state and local emergency management plans; authorizing the Governor to suspend certain licensure requirements in response to an emergency or disaster; requiring certain professional licensing boards to maintain lists of licensees trained in the treatment of mental and emotional trauma and provide those lists to a governmental entity responding to an emergency or disaster; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions regarding response to emergencies. (BDR 16-1220)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Chapter 620. |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | To printer. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 1, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 911.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Waiver granted effective: May 6, 2019. |