NV AB54 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Chapter 170.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Chapter 170.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to energy efficiency; revising provisions relating to the energy efficiency of certain lights sold in this State; repealing obsolete provisions relating to the reduction of grid-based energy purchases for state-owned buildings; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises certain provisions relating to energy efficiency. (BDR 58-327)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Chapter 170. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 111.) To printer. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-20 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-18 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |