NV AB60 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal justice; revising the definition of domestic violence; increasing certain penalties relating to battery which constitutes domestic violence; imposing a fee on certain unlawful acts that constitute domestic violence; requiring such fees to be deposited into the Account for Programs Related to Domestic Violence; revising the definition of stalking; increasing certain penalties related to stalking; revising provisions relating to the crime of facilitating sex trafficking; revising provisions relating to the crime of assault; revising provisions relating to the crime of battery; revising the duties and quorum requirements of the Committee on Domestic Violence; revising provisions relating to the Office of Advocate for Missing or Exploited Children; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions related to criminal justice. (BDR 3-425)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-24AssemblyTo Senate.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2019-04-23AssemblyTo printer.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.)
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 643.) Dispensed with reprinting.
2019-04-23AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2019-04-23AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2019-04-23AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2019-04-23AssemblyTaken from General File.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 392.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-21AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-11-19AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback