NV AB63 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Chapter 16.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Chapter 16.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to vehicles; revising the authority of the Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles to designate the county assessor of a county as an agent to carry out the duties of the Department in that county; revising provisions governing the compensation which must be provided by contract to certain agents appointed by the Department; prohibiting a person from using the name, service marks, trademarks or logo of the Department under certain circumstances; authorizing a vehicle dealer to inspect a moped for the purposes of registration under certain circumstances; authorizing the Director of the Department to contract with a vendor to produce license plates under certain circumstances; clarifying provisions relating to the distribution of certain fees from the Pollution Control Account; revising provisions governing the information which must be included in an application for the issuance of special license plates to a person with a permanent disability; repealing provisions relating to the retention and disposition of certain records of the Department; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing vehicles. (BDR 43-226)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Chapter 16. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-21 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-19 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |