NV AB68 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 377.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to apprenticeships; revising provisions regarding discrimination in apprenticeship programs; revising the membership and operations of the State Apprenticeship Council; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing apprenticeships. (BDR 53-181)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 377.
2019-06-03AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-05-30SenateRead second time.
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-29SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-29AssemblyTo Senate.
2019-05-29AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-05-28AssemblyTo printer.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 1, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.)
2019-05-28AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 997.)
2019-05-28AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-15AssemblyWaiver granted effective: April 12, 2019.
2019-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-26AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-11-20AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback