NV AB85 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 66.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 66.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to mental health; requiring the adoption of regulations governing the involuntary administration of medication to persons with mental illness and the medical examination of a person alleged to be a person in a mental health crisis; authorizing the adoption of regulations concerning the plan for the discharge of a person admitted to a mental health facility or hospital; revising certain terminology and standardizing certain time periods relating to admission to mental health facilities; revising the authority of certain accredited agents to make certain certifications and transport persons with mental illness; revising requirements concerning notification to certain persons of the emergency admission of a person to a mental health facility; revising the procedure for proceedings for the involuntary court-ordered admission of a person to a mental health facility or a program of community-based or outpatient services; authorizing the disclosure to a provider of health care of certain information related to a person who seeks mental health services; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing mental health. (BDR 39-443)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 66. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 126.) To printer. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-27 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-21 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |