NV AB86 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 140.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 140.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental purchasing; making provisions relating to purchasing by local governments applicable to a metropolitan police department; exempting certain purchases by local governments from requirements of competitive bidding; increasing the monetary thresholds at which local governmental purchasing contracts must be advertised; authorizing a local government to dispose of personal property by donating it to another governmental entity or nonprofit organization; authorizing the Administrator of the Purchasing Division of the Department of Administration to enter into a contract pursuant to a solicitation by certain governmental entities; revising provisions governing certain preferences for businesses owned and operated by a veteran with a service-connected disability; making various other changes relating to governmental purchasing; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to governmental purchasing. (BDR 27-182)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 140. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | To printer. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 644.) Dispensed with reprinting. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 620.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-27 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-21 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |