NV AB88 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 141.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 141.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; extending the deadline for certain reports relating to the average daily enrollment of pupils made by a school district to the Department of Education; revising the content of certain quarterly reports made by a school district; revising the information required to be posted online by a school district; revising the manner in which a large school district is required to determine the allocation that will be made to each local school precinct for the next school year; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to public schools. (BDR 34-333)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 141. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 230.) To printer. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-27 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-21 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |