NV AB96 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 589.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to historic preservation; directing the Office of Historic Preservation of the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources to create the Historic Sites Passport Program as a pilot program to issue stamps in a program booklet or passport for participants who visit certain historical sites; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the creation of the Historic Sites Passport Program as a pilot program. (BDR 33-505)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13AssemblyChapter 589.
2019-06-12AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-07AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-06-03SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2019-06-02SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2019-06-01SenateRead second time.
2019-06-01SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-06-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-31SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.
2019-05-31SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-31AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2019-05-31AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass, as amended.
2019-04-16AssemblyTo committee.
2019-04-16AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 49.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-07AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2019-01-30AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-01-24AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback