NV AJR10 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - File No. 40.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing to amend the Nevada Constitution to prospectively increase the required minimum wage paid to employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to prospectively increase the required minimum wage paid to employees. (BDR C-1273)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03AssemblyFile No. 40.
2019-06-03AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
2019-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-05-30SenateRead second time.
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-28SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-05-28SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-28AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1002.) To printer.
2019-05-27AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-05-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-05-23AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
2019-05-22AssemblyWaiver granted effective: May 17, 2019.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback